Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/14/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/10/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/05/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/25/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/14/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/14/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/06/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/09/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/09/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/09/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/19/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/19/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/16/2008