Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/11/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/11/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/11/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/11/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/11/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/11/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/27/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/27/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/12/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/19/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/19/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/23/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/24/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/24/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/27/2007