Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/16/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/15/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/21/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/21/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/21/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/21/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/14/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/10/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/29/2008