Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (09/20/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on August 3, 2007. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Native American $1 Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue $1 coins in commemoration of Native Americans and important contributions made by Indian tribes and individual Native Americans to the development and history of the United States.

Requires, effective beginning January 1, 2008, that such coins have designs: (1) on the obverse bearing the " Sacagawea design;" and (2) on the reverse bearing images celebrating important contributions made by Indian tribes and individual Native Americans to the history and development of the United States.

States that, if the date of the enactment of this Act is after August 25, 2007, such design shall be implemented beginning January 1, 2009.

Requires edge-incusing of the inscriptions "E Pluribus Unum" and "In God We Trust" in a manner that preserves the distinctive coin edge so that its denomination is readily discernible, including by individuals who are blind or visually impaired.

Requires the number of $1 coins minted and issued in a year with the Sacagawea-design on the obverse to be not less than 20% of the total number of $1 coins minted and issued in such year.

Instructs the Secretary of the Treasury to carry out an aggressive, cost-effective, continuing campaign to encourage commercial enterprises to accept and dispense $1 coins that have the so-called "Sacagawea design."