Committees: H.R.236 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/04/2007 Referred to
11/15/2007 Markup by
12/04/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-458
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/07/2007 Referred to
05/17/2007 Hearings by
10/16/2007 Markup by
10/16/2007 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/06/2007 Referred to
09/11/2008 Markup by
09/16/2008 Reported by