Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/07/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/18/2007