Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/18/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2008