Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/11/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/11/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/15/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/12/2008