Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/23/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/07/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/13/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/15/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/28/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/18/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/23/2007