Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/06/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/06/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/06/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/07/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/18/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/18/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/18/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/22/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/22/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/18/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/23/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/07/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/18/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/27/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/02/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/16/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/25/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/12/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/26/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/28/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/28/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/06/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/12/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/12/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/14/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/03/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/10/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/08/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/09/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/26/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/26/2008