Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/05/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/06/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/14/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/15/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/08/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/19/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/04/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/19/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/08/2008