Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/13/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/04/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/16/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/25/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/17/2008