Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/24/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/24/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/15/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/15/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/15/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/28/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/18/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/18/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/18/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/18/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/18/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/25/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/25/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/25/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/18/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/15/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/15/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/15/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/05/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/31/2008