Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/19/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/19/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 08/01/2008