There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

21st Century GI Bill of Rights Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide and enhance education, housing, and entrepreneur assistance for veterans who serve in the Armed Forces after September 11, 2001, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/17/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
06/20/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/29/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/17/2007Referred to House Small Business
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2007Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2007Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2007Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/01/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/13/2007

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/17/2007 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity05/29/2007 Referred to
House Armed Services05/17/2007 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/20/2007 Referred to
House Small Business05/17/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2385. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/17/2007)

21st Century GI Bill of Rights Act of 2007 - Entitles to basic educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill certain members of the Armed Forces or reserves who, after September 11, 2001: (1) are deployed overseas; or (2) serve for an aggregate of at least two years or, before such period, are discharged due to a service-connected disability, hardship, or certain medical conditions. Entitles such individuals to 36 months of educational assistance. Authorizes: (1) specialized training and certification programs for veterans with service-connected disabilities; and (2) payments for tutorial assistance and licensure and certification tests. Requires (with exceptions) the use of such assistance within ten years after the individual's last discharge or release from active duty.

Requires individuals eligible under both the above program and the regular Montgomery GI Bill educational assistance program to elect one program for participation.

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase the maximum guaranty amount under the veterans' home loan program with respect to residences of a particular size in an area for which the median price for such size exceeds the normal guaranty maximum.

Repeals the home loan guaranty fees charged to veterans.

Amends the Small Business Act relating to the microloan program to authorize small business loans to veterans in amounts up to $100,000 at an interest rate of no more than 2.5%.