Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/11/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/18/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/18/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/13/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2008