Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/21/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/15/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/31/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/14/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008