Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/21/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/21/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/11/2007