Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/21/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/15/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/20/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/20/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/20/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/20/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/20/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/20/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/20/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/21/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/21/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/13/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/24/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/24/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/30/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 11/08/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/13/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/07/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/03/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/03/2008