Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/21/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/11/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/23/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/09/2008