Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/05/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 01/09/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/11/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 01/12/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/29/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/31/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/07/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/13/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/08/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/13/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/22/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/19/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/19/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/05/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/26/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/03/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/08/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/16/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/23/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/29/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/29/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/29/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/29/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/19/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/19/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/05/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/01/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/22/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/25/2008