Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/26/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/05/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/29/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/01/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/01/2008