Limit your search

1-25 of 352
  1. S.Amdt.3855 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 12/14/2007) (Proposed 12/14/2007)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 12/14/07 Amendment SA 3855 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  2. S.Amdt.3851 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: To promote legal certainty, enhance competition, and reduce systemic risk in markets for futures and over-the-counter derivatives, and for other purposes.
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 12/13/2007) (Proposed 12/13/2007)
    Cosponsors: 13
    Latest Action: 12/14/07 Amendment SA 3851 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  3. S.Amdt.3849 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/13/2007)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.3845 to S.Amdt.3539 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/12/2007) (Proposed 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 12/13/07 Amendment SA 3845 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  5. S.Amdt.3844 to S.Amdt.3830 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: Relative to public safety officers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 12/12/2007) (Proposed 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 12/14/07 SA 3844 fell when SA 3830 was withdrawn.
  6. S.Amdt.3843 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.3840 to S.Amdt.3830 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.3839 to S.Amdt.3830 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 1
  9. S.Amdt.3838 to S.Amdt.3830 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.3837 to S.Amdt.3830 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.3836 to S.Amdt.3830 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.3835 to S.Amdt.3830 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.3834 to S.Amdt.3630   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 2
  14. S.Amdt.3833 to S.Amdt.3830 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 12/12/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  15. S.Amdt.3830 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: Relative to public safety officers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 12/11/2007) (Proposed 12/11/2007)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 12/14/07 Proposed amendment SA 3830 withdrawn in Senate.
  16. S.Amdt.3829 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] (Submitted 12/11/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  17. S.Amdt.3828 to S.Amdt.3674 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/11/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  18. S.Amdt.3827 to S.Amdt.3822 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 12/11/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
  19. S.Amdt.3826 to S.Amdt.3822 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: To provide for payments under subsections (a) through (e) of section 2604 of the Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Act of 1981, and restore supplemental agricultural disaster assistance from the Agriculture Disaster Relief Trust Fund.
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/11/2007) (Proposed 12/11/2007)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/14/07 SA 3826 fell when SA 3822 was withdrawn.
  20. S.Amdt.3825 to S.Amdt.3673 (which amends S.Amdt.3500)   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/11/2007) (Proposed 12/11/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/12/07 Proposed amendment SA 3825 withdrawn in Senate.
  21. S.Amdt.3824 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/11/2007)
    Cosponsors: 1
  22. S.Amdt.3823 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: To provide for the review of agricultural mergers and acquisitions by the Department of Justice, and for other purposes.
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/10/2007) (Proposed 12/10/2007)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 12/14/07 Proposed amendment SA 3823 withdrawn in Senate.
  23. S.Amdt.3822 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: To provide nearly $1,000,000,000 in critical home heating assistance to low-income families and senior citizens for the 2007-2008 winter season, and reduce the Federal deficit by eliminating wasteful farm subsidies.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/10/2007) (Proposed 12/10/2007)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/14/07 Proposed amendment SA 3822 withdrawn in Senate.
  24. S.Amdt.3821 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: To promote the nutritional health of school children, with an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] (Submitted 12/10/2007) (Proposed 12/10/2007)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/14/07 Proposed amendment SA 3821 withdrawn in Senate.
  25. S.Amdt.3820 to S.Amdt.3500   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 12/07/2007)
    Cosponsors: 1