Committees: H.R.2419 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/22/2007 Referred to
07/19/2007 Markup by
07/23/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-256
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry05/22/2007 Referred to
06/14/2007 Markup by
06/14/2007 Reported by
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, Energy, and Research05/22/2007 Referred to
05/22/2007 Markup by
05/22/2007 Reported by
House Agriculture Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management05/22/2007 Referred to
06/19/2007 Markup by
06/19/2007 Reported by
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Horticulture and Organic Agriculture05/22/2007 Referred to
06/07/2007 Markup by
06/07/2007 Reported by
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry05/22/2007 Referred to
05/24/2007 Markup by
05/24/2007 Reported by
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Specialty Crops, Rural Development, and Foreign Agriculture05/22/2007 Referred to
06/06/2007 Markup by
06/06/2007 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs05/22/2007 Referred to
07/23/2007 Discharged from