Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/14/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/23/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/06/2007