Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/14/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/27/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/21/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/26/2007