Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/12/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/11/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/15/2008