Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/24/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/05/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/11/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/11/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/11/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/12/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/12/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/18/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/18/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/18/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/19/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/21/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/21/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/25/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/26/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/28/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/10/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/10/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/12/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 08/01/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/06/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/24/2007