There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sewage Overflow Community Right-to-Know Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Raw Sewage Overflow Community Right-to-Know Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to ensure that publicly owned treatment works monitor for and report sewer overflows, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to ensure that sewage treatment plants monitor for and report discharges of raw sewage, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/23/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5820-5821)
06/19/2008Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-723.
05/23/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/01/2008SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
06/24/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/23/2008-4:41pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2008-4:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2008-4:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5820-5821)
06/23/2008-4:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2452.
06/23/2008-4:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5820-5824)
06/23/2008-4:28pmHouseMs. Johnson, E. B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/19/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 458.
06/19/2008HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-723.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/15/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/15/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/07/2008HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
05/07/2008HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
05/25/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/23/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
05/23/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/23/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/23/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/26/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/11/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/11/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/11/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/26/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/26/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/04/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/31/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/03/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/23/2007 Referred to
05/15/2008 Markup by
06/19/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-723
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment05/25/2007 Referred to
05/07/2008 Markup by
05/07/2008 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works08/01/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2452. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/23/2008)

Sewage Overflow Community Right-to-Know Act - Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to require owners or operators of publicly owned treatment works to: (1) institute monitoring systems to provide timely alerts of sewer overflows; (2) notify the public, not later than 24 hours after receiving knowledge, of such overflows in areas where human health is potentially affected; (3) notify public health authorities and other affected entities, in the case of an overflow that may imminently and substantially endanger human health, immediately after the owner or operator knows of the overflow; (4) report each overflow on discharge monitoring reports to the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) or the state; and (5) annually report to the Administrator or the state on the total number of overflows in a calendar year.

Makes specified exceptions to notification and reporting requirements for backups into single-family residences and for overflows that occur in the course of treatment works maintenance, respectively.

Requires annual summary reports by states to the Administrator.

Requires the Administrator to issue regulations, including to establish overflow assessment guidance and develop communications measures to provide notification under this Act. Provides procedures for review and approval, after issuance of such regulations, of state notification programs.

Makes the monitoring systems eligible for state water pollution control revolving fund assistance.