Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/23/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/23/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/26/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/11/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/11/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/11/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/26/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/26/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/04/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/31/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/03/2008