Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/14/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/27/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/18/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/06/2007