Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/23/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/18/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/16/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/30/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/07/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/17/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/03/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/09/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/09/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/15/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/23/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/23/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/30/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/01/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/08/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/08/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/14/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/14/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/11/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/17/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/26/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/11/2008