Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/12/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/12/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/12/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/12/2008