Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/26/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/26/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/17/2008