Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/13/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/11/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/16/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/19/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/31/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/17/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/2008