Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/25/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 01/28/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/03/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew