Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 08/02/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 08/03/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/01/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2007