Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/21/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/14/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/21/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/03/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/03/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/09/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/12/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/18/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/26/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/15/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/16/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/22/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/15/2008