There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 31, United States Code, to require the inscription "In God We Trust" to appear on a face of the $1 coins honoring each of the Presidents of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/24/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/24/2007Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/24/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 08/03/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/07/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/29/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/24/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2510. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/24/2007)

Revises federal coin design requirements for $1 coins honoring each of the Presidents of the United States. Transfers from the edge of such a coin to either the obverse or the reverse face the inscription "In God We Trust."