Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 08/03/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/07/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/29/2008