Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/13/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/26/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/26/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/05/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/14/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/02/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/15/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/15/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/15/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/17/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/23/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/30/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/06/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/06/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/03/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/22/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/20/2008