Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/21/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/21/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/01/2007