Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/06/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/18/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/19/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/15/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/06/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/29/2008