Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/06/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/31/2008