Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/07/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/11/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/19/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/19/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/21/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/25/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/25/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/25/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/25/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/17/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/26/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/26/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/18/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/18/2007