Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/18/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/04/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2008