Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/18/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/03/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/07/2008