Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/03/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/01/2008