Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/14/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/13/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2008