Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/20/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/19/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/17/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/23/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/12/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/18/2008